House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Original reference removed: Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|