|
06/25/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-262
|
|
|
|
06/24/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 114680 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (114680)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 148
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/22/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|