House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
PCS added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|