Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis December 20, 2023
Analysis December 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill December 21, 2023