Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0273 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 25, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024