House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/27/2023 | Filed |