Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 28, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 27, 2024
Analysis December 13, 2023
Analysis December 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill December 13, 2023