House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Filed |