Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024