Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 11, 2024