Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024