|
04/12/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-80
|
|
|
|
04/11/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 74, NAYS 36
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment 241284 Concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 24 NAYS 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (702123)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (241284)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 73, NAYS 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Concurred in Senate amendment 846392 as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 702123 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (846392)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1492
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 79, NAYS 33
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 590295 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 252721 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 354735 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 957329 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 702461 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 884917 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 615961 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Original reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
PCS added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|