House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | PCS added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Filed |