House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
PCS added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/22/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|