Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis December 6, 2023
Analysis November 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024