Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2024