House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Favorable by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/28/2023
|
Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|