Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 27, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024