Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024