Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024