Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis December 20, 2023
Analysis December 8, 2023