Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0587 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis December 20, 2023
Analysis December 8, 2023