House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/28/2023 | Filed |