Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill January 17, 2024