House | 03/08/2024 | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/28/2023 | Filed |