Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024