House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Filed |