Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0705 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024