House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/04/2023 | Filed |