Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0725 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024