Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0739 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024