House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Original reference removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | PCS added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Filed |