House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee(Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|