Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0781 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024