Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0813 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2024