House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|