Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0819 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024