House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/12/2023 | Filed |