Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0855 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2024
Analysis June 3, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024