Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0865 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024