House | 03/08/2024 | Died in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Filed |