Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0923 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 27, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024