House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable with CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
PCS added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|