Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0937 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024