Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024