House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Now in Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Ways & Means Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Filed |