|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-177; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 958 (Ch. 2024-90)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1486
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment 256807 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|