Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1093 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024