House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Filed |