Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024